Ramadan, Said Abdel Rahman Said (CPSO#: 80246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wonderland Medicentre
1375 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON  N6H 0J1
Phone: (519) 471-6686
Fax: (519) 471-2801
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Said Ramadan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramadan ( CPSO# 80246 )

Business Address:
1375 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0J1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAID ABDEL RAHMAN SAID RAMADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMADAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2003 to 01 Apr 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009