Ramadan, Samir Ibrahim (CPSO#: 95513)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records to be kept at Port Credit Medical Centre - Mississauga & MCI Walk In Doctors office - Toronto (the clinics Dr. worked in before he left Ontario, effective October 15, 2013)
Instructions: Patient to contact clinic where they saw Dr. Ramadan
Date Received: 12 Sep 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2017