Ramanathan, Usha (CPSO#: 90189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Usha Ramanathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Ramanathan ( CPSO# 90189 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. USHA RAMANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2009 to 08 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2012