Rambaran, Navindranauth (CPSO#: 94216)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Guyana, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2010 to 06 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 07 Oct 2010 to 15 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2010