Rambihar, Sherryn Priya (CPSO#: 82697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 312
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 591-1333
Fax: (416) 591-6333
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.P. Rambihar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rambihar ( CPSO# 82697 )

Business Address:
790 Bay Street
Suite 312
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 591-1333

Business Address:
500 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Business Address:
3302 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 438-2106

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRYN PRIYA RAMBIHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMBIHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2009