Ramdass, Chitra (CPSO#: 96992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17730 Leslie St
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

270 Doak Ln
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

6981 Millecreek Dr
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chitra Ramdass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ramdass ( CPSO# 96992 )

Business Address:
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4

Business Address:
270 Doak Lane
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A5

Business Address:
6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHITRA RAMDASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMDASS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2013