Ramer, Sarah Anne (CPSO#: 82193)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2005 to 04 Mar 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 03 May 2006 to 30 May 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007