Ramien, Michele Louise (CPSO#: 88661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1995
Fax: (613) 738-4298
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville, ON
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

75 Bruyere St
2nd floor
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Canada
Phone: 613-562-6354 Ext. 1
Fax: 613-562-6022
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michele Ramien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ramien ( CPSO# 88661 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C6
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE LOUISE RAMIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014