Ramin, Brodie (CPSO#: 90865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oasis
Sandy Hill Community Health Center
1st floor, 221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Canada
Phone: (613) 569-3488
Fax: (613) 569-3484
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRODIE RAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011