Ramji, Alnoor (CPSO#: 79639)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French, Swahili

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2004