Ramji, Noor Nizar Walji (CPSO#: 88737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Bond Family Practice Unit
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone: (416) 864-3011
Fax: (416) 864-3099
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noor Nizar Walji Ramji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ramji ( CPSO# 88737 )

Business Address:
The Health Centre
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOOR NIZAR WALJI RAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010