Ramji, Taheera (CPSO#: 86303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taheera Ramji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ramji ( CPSO# 86303 )

Business Address:
Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
327 Reynolds Street
Oakville ON  L6J 2L7
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
9 Lake Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V1
Phone Number: (905) 664-9992

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAHEERA RAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011