Rammohan, Surianarayanan (CPSO#: 65723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
140 Niagara St.
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone: (905) 685-3337
Fax: (905) 685-3363
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

401-849 Upper Wentworth St.
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Canada
Phone: 905-538-5100
Fax: 905-538-5101
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Rammohan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rammohan ( CPSO# 65723 )

Business Address:
101 - 140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone Number: (905) 685-3337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SURIANARAYANAN RAMMOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMMOHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1995