Ramphal, Raveena (CPSO#: 78210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Suite 2639
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2370
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raveena Ramphal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ramphal ( CPSO# 78210 )

Business Address:
C H E O
Suite 2639
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 May 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2011 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Raveena Ramphal may practise medicine only,

                  (a)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Ottawa, in which Dr. Ramphal holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (b)   in accordance with the requirement of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Ramphal no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.