Ramsdale, Elizabeth Helen (CPSO#: 33247)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 24 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018