Ramsingh, Rosemarie Ruella (CPSO#: 66576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
First Nations and Inuit Health,
Ontario Region
2720 Riverside Drive
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: 613-941-8120
Fax: 613-946-4203
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSEMARIE RUELLA RAMSINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2000