Rana, Alia Waqas (CPSO#: 83181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: Rana, Alia (used until: 18 Dec 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alia Rana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rana ( CPSO# 83181 )

Business Address:
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H1
Phone Number: (905) 547-0505

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIA WAQAS RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009