Rana, Fakhara Nasreen (CPSO#: 71464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 117
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 845-8884
Fax: (905) 844-5537
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAKHARA NASREEN RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001