Rana, Punam (CPSO#: 87303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Street
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Rana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rana ( CPSO# 87303 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNAM RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011