Rana, Robina Iftikhar (CPSO#: 95315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Professional Building
679 Davis Drive
Unit 204
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 235-8881
Fax: 905-235-8861
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Diabetes Education Centre
The Tannery Mall
465 Davis Drive, Suite 213
Newmarket ON  L3Y 7T9
Canada
Phone: (905)895-4521 Ext. 5650
Fax: (905)853-3180
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

8730 The Gore Road
Brampton ON  L6P 0B1
Canada
Phone: 647-557-2232
Fax: 289-720-2047
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robina Rana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rana ( CPSO# 95315 )

Business Address:
Diabetes Education Centre
213-465 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 7T9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Suite 204
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 235-8881

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBINA IFTIKHAR RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2015