Rana, Shabana (CPSO#: 93164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle
Suite 104
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHABANA RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012