Randazzo, Mary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 429-6975
Fax: (519) 429-6945
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1405 Edward st
Hearst
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Canada
Phone: 705-362-4291
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

75 Parkview Rd
Hagersville Ontario
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: 905-768-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. E. Randazzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Randazzo ( CPSO# 71434 )

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 429-6975

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Business Address:
179 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A3
Phone Number: (905) 777-9779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH RANDAZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDAZZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007