Randhawa, Varinder Kaur (CPSO#: 93174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
585 University Avenue
11PMB-131
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: 416-340-4012
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARINDER KAUR RANDHAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDHAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014