Ranev, Dimitre (CPSO#: 93112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Medical Du Plateau
195 Rue De L'Atmosphere
Gatineau QC  J9A 0A3
Phone: (819) 776-0001
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 210
1545 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8P9
Canada
Phone: 613-521-8313
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRE RANEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012