Ranganathan, Meenatchi (CPSO#: 89447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Vinayaka Mission's Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 3N10
McMaster Children's hospital
1200 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73687
Fax: (905) 522-7982
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

302-25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 523-7920
Fax: (905) 523-5121
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Ranganathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ranganathan ( CPSO# 89447 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 3N10
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Suite 302
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 523-7920

Business Address:
Suite 5
35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S5
Phone Number: (905) 648-8999

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEENATCHI RANGANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013