Rao, Rajeev Velidindla (CPSO#: 84254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Cardiology Associates
Unit 307, 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 735-1111
Fax: (705) 735-1888
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46215
Fax: (705) 739-5698
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajeev Rao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rao ( CPSO# 84254 )

Business Address:
Georgian Cardiology Associates
125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 307
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 735-1111

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJEEV VELIDINDLA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011