Rao, Talupur Naga Anuradha (CPSO#: 78625)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005