Raoof, Shariqa (CPSO#: 94339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 566-1010
Fax: (905) 566-0440
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Raoof Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Raoof ( CPSO# 94339 )

Business Address:
Tri-Hospital Sleep Laboratory West
208 - 3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 566-1010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Shariqa Raoof may practice medicine independently in sleep medicine, only.