Raouf-Alkadhimi, Ahmed Fouad (CPSO#: 89638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Acton Medical And
Urgent Care Clinic
10 Eastern Avenue
Acton ON  L7J 0A5
Phone: (519) 853-4449
Fax: (519) 853-5242
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raouf-Alkadhimi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raouf-Alkadhimi ( CPSO# 89638 )

Business Address:
Acton Medical and Urgent Care Clinic
10 Eastern Avenue
Acton ON  L7J 0A5
Phone Number: (519) 853-4449

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 9, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ahmed Fouad Raouf-
            Alkadhimi in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Raouf-
            Alkadhimi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") of
                                    DR. AHMED FOUAD RAOUF-ALKADHIMI
                                      ("Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi") to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, certificate of registration number 89638, am a
                  member of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that the College initiated an
                  investigation bearing File Number 107044 (the "Investigation") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  family practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College
                  will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

             (6)  Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to practise under the guidance of
                        a clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that I have reviewed the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix
                        "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).
                        The Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every three (3) months;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) to twenty (20) of my patient
                              charts at every meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical 
                              Supervisor(s) deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall
                        be selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to cooperate fully with the
                        Clinical Supervision of my practice conducted under the term of
                        this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide
                        by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s) including, but
                        not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                   (e)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to
                        this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within
                        thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to participate in and
                        successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached
                        hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional
                        education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in:
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                              2.    patient interactions; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical
                               Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to provide proof to the College
                        of my successful completion of the Professional Education,
                        including proof of registration and attendance and participant
                        assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I
                        acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole
                        discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional
                        Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                   (d)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to complete this requirement
                        within six (6) months of the date that I execute this Undertaking
                        or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the
                        first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake that, approximately six (6)
                        months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in
                        section (6) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard. I further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake that, following the decision
                        referenced in section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has
                        determined are reasonable.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, hereby consent to the following being
                        included on the Public Register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code:
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
             (9)  Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but
                        not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, give my irrevocable consent to the College
                        to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        and NMS consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and
                        Appendix "D", respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision
                  of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct
                  and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

             (16) Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that, during the time period
                        that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                        Raouf-Alkadhimi engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                        incompetent in the practice of family medicine. As a result of the
                        investigation:
                  
                              "Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi will practise under the guidance of a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve
                              months.
                  
                              "Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi will engage in professional education in
                              medical record keeping and patient interactions.
                  
                              "Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi's practice will be reassessed by an
                              assessor selected by the College within six months of the end
                              of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to any person who requires this
                  information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.
             (19)I, Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking;
                         and/or
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ahmed Fouad Raouf-Alkadhimi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 9, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months.

Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and patient interactions.

Dr. Raouf-Alkadhimi’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.