Rapanos, Theodore (CPSO#: 77975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Room 508 5 North
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44652
Fax: (905) 529-8946
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Vascular
2035 Cornwall Road
Suite 18
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Canada
Phone: (905) 815-0995
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Theodore Rapanos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rapanos ( CPSO# 77975 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone Number: (905) 538-2262

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Room 508 5 North
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
18 - 1525 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 815-0999

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE RAPANOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPANOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007