Raphael, Michael Jonathon (CPSO#: 97846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
25 King Street West
Kingston ON
Kingston ON  K7L5P9
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 4501
Fax: 613-546-8209
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Nathanson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nathanson ( CPSO# 27665 )
Dr. D. Raphael ( CPSO# 98485 )
Dr. M. Raphael ( CPSO# 97846 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
801 Mohawk Road West
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone Number: (905) 318-5119

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 318-5119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHON RAPHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHAEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2017