Rappaport, Rebecca Verna (CPSO#: 95258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
22 Wing Family Medical Clinic
95 Manston Cres
Hornell Heights ON  P0H 1P0
Phone: 705-494-2149
Fax: 705-494-6228
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Dr
PO Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: 705-474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rappaport ( CPSO# 95258 )

Business Address:
22 Wing Family Medical Clinic
95 Manston Crescent
North Bay ON  P0H 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 495-2011

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
P.O. Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA VERNA RAPPAPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPPAPORT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013