Rasalingam, Pamini (CPSO#: 91951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G2B8
Canada
Phone: 9058730111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

274 Dundas St. East
Suite 303
Belleville ON  K8N1E6
Canada
Phone: 6137797575
Fax: 6137797575
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMINI RASALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2016