Rasasingham, Rajeevan (CPSO#: 92014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 43153
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rasasingham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rasasingham ( CPSO# 92014 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 823-7079

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJEEVAN RASASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASASINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2012