Rasool, Kashif Ghulam (CPSO#: 94598)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Windsor-Essex Community Health Centre Suite 101 1361 Ouellette Avenue Windsor ON N8X 1J6
Date Received: 23 Mar 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018