Rastogi, Shalini (CPSO#: 76477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thornhill Family Practice
Unit 35
7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone: (905) 881-6510
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shalini Rastogi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rastogi ( CPSO# 76477 )

Business Address:
Thornhill Family Practice
35 - 7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 881-6510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Mar 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHALINI RASTOGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASTOGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2004