Ratcliffe, Elyanne Marguerite (CPSO#: 72283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics 3A-27
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-2655
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELYANNE MARGUERITE RATCLIFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATCLIFFE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2004