Rathbun, James Broatch (CPSO#: 20853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1967

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C07 - 3000 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 267-2334
Fax: (416) 267-2539
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Broatch Rathbun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rathbun ( CPSO# 20853 )

Business Address:
3306 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 267-2334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 06 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES BROATCH RATHBUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHBUN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)