Rathee, Rajinder Singh (CPSO#: 70079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Farsi, French, Gujarati, Hindi, Italian, Mandarin, Panjabi/Punjabi, Tamil, Urdu

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York Eye Associates
Suite 202
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-7455
Fax: (416) 494-4833
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Herzig Eye Institute
150 Bloor Street West #210
Toronto ON  M5S 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-2020
Fax: (416) 929-0232
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

NVISION Centres
33 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2E3
Canada
Phone: 416-928-0777
Fax: 416-928-6677
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajinder Rathee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rathee ( CPSO# 70079 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-7455

Business Address:
33 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2E3

Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 202
North York ON  M2J 1V1

Business Address:
Herzig Eye Institute
Suite 210
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 929-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJINDER SINGH RATHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001