Ratnasingam, Ranjith Kumar (CPSO#: 89193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Crown Point Family Health Centre
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone: (905) 577-0667
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ranjith K. Ratnasingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ratnasingam ( CPSO# 89193 )

Business Address:
Crown Point Family Health Centre
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Upper Level
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone Number: (905) 577-0667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANJITH KUMAR RATNASINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATNASINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2013