Ratnayake, Wasantha Priyani (CPSO#: 83049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-3675
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Ratnayake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ratnayake ( CPSO# 83049 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WASANTHA PRIYANI RATNAYAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATNAYAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007