Rau, Neil Vivek (CPSO#: 66023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 416
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 844-5346
Fax: (905) 849-6551
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Healthcare
Dept. of Laboratory Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 6641
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Rau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rau ( CPSO# 66023 )

Business Address:
203 - 358 Reynolds Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L9
Phone Number: (905) 844-5346

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 22 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL VIVEK RAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1992