Raukar, Mary Catherine (CPSO#: 90489)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 31 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Aug 2011 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2015