Ravi, Monidipa (CPSO#: 88775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: Bhattacharyya, Monidipa (used until: 29 May 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
First Floor Burton Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7005
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M Ravi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ravi ( CPSO# 88775 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Psychiatry
First Floor Burton Wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 29 Feb 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIDIPA RAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2016