Ravindran, Mathura Pandian (CPSO#: 92043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C19 & C20
2761 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON  M1X 0A4
Phone: (416) 292-9111
Fax: (416) 293-9051
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathura P. Ravindran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ravindran ( CPSO# 92043 )

Business Address:
C 19 & C 20
2761 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1X 0A4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 4, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mathura Pandian
            Ravindran in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ravindran
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                    DR.  MATHURA PANDIAN RAVINDRAN
                                           ("Dr. Ravindran")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ravindran, certificate of registration number 92043, am a member
                  of the College.  
            (3)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that following the College investigation
                  bearing File Number 97785, I was required to complete a Specified
                  Continuing Education or Remediation Program. The reassessment report
                  subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of
                  practice in family medicine.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective 
                  immediately.  
                  
            (5)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, effective January 1, 2019,
                        which is attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Resignation
                        Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ravindran, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake that, effective January 1, 2019, I will
                        not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or
                        administer any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");                       
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to immediately:
                  
                        (i)   provide notice to patients that I will be resigning my
                              prescribing privileges effective January 1, 2019;
                  
                        (ii)  begin the process of referring all patients to whom I am
                              prescribing any of the substances described in section
                              (5)(c), above, to other physicians for assessments and care;
                              and
                  
                        (iii) not accept any new patients who are currently requiring
                              prescriptions for any of the substances described in section
                              (5)(c), above.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred
                        to other physicians pursuant to section (5)(d), above (the "Log").
                        I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to include in the Log the name of each
                        patient referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the
                        date of referral. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake that effective January 1, 2019, I will return
                  any supplies of the substances referred to in section (5)(c) above that
                  are presently in my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and
                  secure manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 7-16,
                  "Prescribing Drugs."

            (7)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake that effective January 1, 2019, I shall
                        post a sign in all waiting rooms and in each examination and
                        consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                        and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."  For
                        further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                        IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. Ravindran has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the
                        following: 
                        
                        Narcotic Drugs
                        Narcotic Preparations
                        Controlled Drugs
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (7)(a) above, in all waiting rooms and in each examination
                        and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (7)(b), to the College by January 1, 2019.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (7)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (7)(d).
                  
            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        six (6) months on the terms set out below (the "Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to meet with my Clinical Supervisor at
                        least once every two (2) weeks for a minimum of the first two (2)
                        months of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that at the first four (4) meetings,
                        the Clinical Supervisor will directly observe at least five (5)
                        patient encounters.
                  
                  (d)   After a minimum of two (2) months of Clinical Supervision, upon the
                        recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval by the
                        College, I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor at least once every month for the remainder of the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that if approval is not provided by
                        the College, I will continue to meet with my supervisor once every
                        two (2) weeks as set out in section (8)(b) above.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "F", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "G";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for at
                              least the first two (2) months, and monthly thereafter upon
                              recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval of the
                              College;
                  
                        (iv)  Directly observe at least five (5) patient encounters at the
                              first four (4) 
                              meetings;
                  
                        (v)   Review at least ten (10) to fifteen (15) of my patient charts
                              at every meeting, including the charts for all direct
                              observation patient encounters;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "G", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated
                        July 14, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Ravindran , undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "F" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to ensure that Appendix "F" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "F" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(i)
                        and/or (j) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (8)(k) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "G", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   CMPAe-moduleDocumentation1:Charting Medical Records:
                              https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/serve/elas/DocumentationCharting/docume
                              ntation_charting-e.html?id=website; and
                  
                        (ii)  CMPA e-module Documentation 2: Principles of Medical Record
                              Keeping:
                              https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/serve/elas/DocumentationPrinciples/documentation_principles-e.html?id=website 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education within one (1)
                        month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will
                        determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to complete this requirement by January
                        1, 2019.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (8) above and Appendix "F" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss
                        with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ravindran, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ravindran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "H" and Appendix "I",
                        respectively. 
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred
                  to in this
                  Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (17)  I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ravindran, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a College investigation, Dr. Ravindran was required
                              to complete a Specified Continuing Education or Remediation
                              Program. The reassessment report subsequently received by the
                              College raised concerns about his standard of practice in
                              family medicine. As a result of the reassessment: 
                  
                                    Effective January 1, 2019, Dr. Ravindran must not issue
                                    new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for
                                    or administer any of the following substances:
                  
                                    (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control
                                          Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                          Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                                    (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                          Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                          Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                                    (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and
                                          Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act,
                                          S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  
                                    (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                          (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                          Substances Regulations made under the Controlled
                                          Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                                    (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the
                                          Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O.
                                          2010, c. 22);        
                  
                                          and as amended from time to time.
                  
                                    Effective January 1, 2019, Dr. Ravindran must post a
                                    clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each
                                    examination and consulting room, in all Practice
                                    Locations, which states as follows: 
                                    
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                    Dr. Ravindran has agreed not to prescribe or administer
                                    any of the
                                    following: 
                  
                                    Narcotic Drugs
                                    Narcotic Preparations
                                    Controlled Drugs
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                                    Dr. Ravindran's practice will be supervised by a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a
                                    minimum of six (6) months.
                  
                                    Dr. Ravindran will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record-keeping.
                  
                                    Following the professional education and period of
                                    supervision, Dr. Ravindran's practice will be
                                    re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Ravindran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Ravindran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Ravindran, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "F";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mathura Pandian Ravindran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 4, 2018:

Following a College investigation, Dr. Ravindran was required to complete a Specified Continuing Education or Remediation Program. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. As a result of the reassessment:
Effective January 1, 2019, Dr. Ravindran must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:
(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
Effective January 1, 2019, Dr. Ravindran must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
Dr. Ravindran has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:
Narcotic Drugs
Narcotic Preparations
Controlled Drugs
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
All other Monitored Drugs
Dr. Ravindran’s practice will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of six (6) months.
Dr. Ravindran will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Ravindran’s practice will be re-assessed.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective October 9, 2018.
Download Full Document (PDF)