Rawal, Sapna (CPSO#: 95417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neuroradiology
McL Wing 3rd Floor Room 419
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5530
Fax: (416) 603-4257
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sapna Rawal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rawal ( CPSO# 95417 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neuroradiology
McL Wing 3rd Floor Room 419
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAPNA RAWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013