Rawal, Shail (CPSO#: 91272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 8E-422
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 3425
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shail Rawal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rawal ( CPSO# 91272 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 8E-407
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAIL RAWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013