Ray, Christopher Patrick (CPSO#: 95287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HWMH - Operating Room
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone: (519) 800-8847
Fax: (226) 782-9757
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher P. Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ray ( CPSO# 95287 )

Business Address:
HWMH - Operating Room
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (519) 800-8847

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PATRICK RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2014