Ray, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 86319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
143 Metcalfe Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-2224
Fax: (519) 846-2005
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ray ( CPSO# 86319 )

Business Address:
143 Metcalfe Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-2224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010