Ray, Lawrie Jean Marion (CPSO#: 95983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: Hamilton, Lawrie Jean Marion (used until: 19 Feb 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: 613-256-9370
Fax: 613-256-0949
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Couchiching Family Health Team
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Canada
Phone: 705-329-3649
Fax: 705-329-0653
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrie Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2016


Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrie Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ray ( CPSO# 95983 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-9370

Business Address:
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 329-3649

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRIE JEAN MARION RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Trauma

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2018